Global patent index - EP 0973588 A1

EP 0973588 A1 2000-01-26 - PSYCHOLOGICAL STIMULATING TOY

Title (en)

PSYCHOLOGICAL STIMULATING TOY

Title (de)

PSYCHOLOGISCH STIMULIERENDES SPIELZEUG

Title (fr)

JOUET DE STIMULATION PSYCHOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0973588 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97943214 A

Priority

  • KZ 9700005 W
  • KZ 970103 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9833567A1] The invention is related to the toys, forming geometric forms without additional, auxiliary elements and also may be used in the medical purposes as a psychological element. The task of the invention is the rising of the taking up and the development of the spatial colourful imagination for the removal of the psychological discomfort. The essence of the invention is that the elements made in the aspect of the gathering plates installing on the pivot with the capacity of the axleing rotation, the transversing moving but butt-ends and cuts of the plates selected by the colour by the segments. The invention may be used as a brooch of keys. The toy simultaneously is a friction for the development of the dexterity and the sense of the fingers. Constructing the ribbing form of the toy we may use it as a massage, riding it between the palm of the hand and the definite parts of the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/08 (2006.01); A63F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/0811 (2013.01); A63F 9/08 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0007 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0027 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9833567A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9833567 A1 19980806; DE 69711456 D1 20020502; DE 69711456 T2 20021010; EP 0973588 A1 20000126; EP 0973588 B1 20020327; HK 1027302 A1 20030404; RU 2150313 C1 20000610

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031002

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69711456

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020502

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2002-03-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990827

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE