Global patent index - EP 0973599 A1

EP 0973599 A1 2000-01-26 - DRYER FOR COMPRESSED AIR

Title (en)

DRYER FOR COMPRESSED AIR

Title (de)

TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRUCKLUFT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SECHAGE D'AIR COMPRIME

Publication

EP 0973599 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98903998 A

Priority

  • DE 9800018 W
  • DE 19714887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722731A1] A compressed air drying unit has a membrane filter (preferably a bundle of hollow fibre membranes) which separates preferably counter-current flows of compressed air and flushing air and which is selectively permeable to water vapour, a feed line (32) being provided for feeding dried compressed air from the compressed air outlet (24) to the flushing air inlet (26) of the filter. The novelty is that the feed line (32) includes a shut-off device (34), the shutting position of which is modified by the compressed air usage. Preferably, a flow sensor is provided for measuring the dried compressed air flow from the outlet (24) to a consumer and sends an output signal, optionally via a control unit, to the electrical, electromagnetic, pneumatic or hydraulic drive of the shut-off device (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/22 (2006.01); B01D 53/26 (2006.01); B01D 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/268 (2013.01); B01D 53/22 (2013.01); B01D 63/02 (2013.01); B01D 2313/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845025A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722731 A1 19981015; EP 0973599 A1 20000126; EP 0973599 B1 20020807; JP 2001524867 A 20011204; US 6296683 B1 20011002; WO 9845025 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805108

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020912

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011002

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT