Global patent index - EP 0973615 A1

EP 0973615 A1 2000-01-26 - METHOD FOR CLEANING WASTE PROCESS GASES CONTAINING DUST

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CLEANING WASTE PROCESS GASES CONTAINING DUST

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON STAUBBELADENEN PROZESSABGASEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'EFFLUENTS GAZEUX DE PROCEDE CHARGES DE POUSSIERE

Publication

EP 0973615 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912138 A

Priority

  • AT 9800088 W
  • AT 62197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846359A1] The invention relates to a method for cleaning waste process gases containing water vapour and dust, in a wet-type electrostatic filter. According to this method, the gases which pass through said wet-type electrostatic filter are charged in a space between one or several emission electrodes and one or several collecting electrodes and the particles of dust are precipitated on the collecting electrode(s). The invention is characterized in that the speed at which the waste gases pass through the wet-type electrostatic filter is set at a value of 4 m/s to 9 m/s.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/16; B03C 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/16 (2006.01); B03C 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/16 (2013.01); B03C 3/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846359A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846359 A1 19981022; AT 221416 T 20020815; AT A62197 A 20000715; AU 6711698 A 19981111; AU 735231 B2 20010705; CN 1252016 A 20000503; DE 59805002 D1 20020905; EP 0973615 A1 20000126; EP 0973615 B1 20020731

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050403

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2005-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2005-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2004-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-04-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040408

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-04-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59805002

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020905

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE GB IT

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 221416

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020815

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990820

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE GB IT