Global Patent Index - EP 0973620 A1

EP 0973620 A1 2000-01-26 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING OR DRYING WORK PIECES

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING OR DRYING WORK PIECES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN ODER TROCKNEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR NETTOYER OU SECHER DES PIECES

Publication

EP 0973620 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930632 A

Priority

  • DE 9801006 W
  • DE 19714603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19714603C1] The invention relates to a device and method for cleaning and drying work pieces in a treatment vessel (1) in which it is possible to produce a negative pressure. During the cleaning process, a liquid bath (50) is formed in the treatment vessel (1), said liquid bath surrounding the work pieces at least partially, and cleaning fluid and optionally a gaseous medium are introduced into the treatment vessel (1) under excess pressure via a spray unit (8a, 8b). The work piece support moves up and down or rotates so that the work pieces are subjected alternately to different cleaning processes in the liquid bath (50) and a gas chamber (52) situated above said liquid bath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/04; B08B 3/10; C23G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/04 (2006.01); B08B 3/10 (2006.01); F26B 5/04 (2006.01); F26B 7/00 (2006.01); F26B 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/14 (2013.01); B08B 3/045 (2013.01); B08B 3/10 (2013.01); F26B 5/04 (2013.01); F26B 5/048 (2013.01); F26B 7/00 (2013.01); F26B 11/18 (2013.01); F26B 11/181 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845059A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714603 C1 19981029; AT 246552 T 20030815; AU 8101098 A 19981030; BR 9808526 A 20000523; CA 2286102 A1 19981015; CA 2286102 C 20070918; EP 0973620 A1 20000126; EP 0973620 B1 20030806; EP 0973620 B2 20080625; EP 1342969 A2 20030910; EP 1342969 A3 20060607; EP 1342969 B1 20130529; US 6253462 B1 20010703; WO 9845059 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160408

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 246552 T

- Effective date: 20160408

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809214

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-07-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-06-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2004-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DUERR ECOCLEAN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809214 P 20030911

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI