Global Patent Index - EP 0973641 A1

EP 0973641 A1 2000-01-26 - DAMPENING ROLLER

Title (en)

DAMPENING ROLLER

Title (de)

FEUCHTMITTELWALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU DE MOUILLAGE

Publication

EP 0973641 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928134 A

Priority

  • DE 9800958 W
  • DE 19714222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19714222C1] The invention relates to a dampening roller (6) which functions reliably and can be driven by friction. Said dampening roller has an elastic surface and can be produced economically by placing thrust rings (17, 18) of equal diameter at both ends, said driving rings also being of the same surface material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01); B41N 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2013.01); B41N 7/04 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845117A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714222 C1 19980416; EP 0973641 A1 20000126; EP 0973641 B1 20011107; EP 0973641 B2 20060920; JP 2000510069 A 20000808; JP 3204990 B2 20010904; US 6293191 B1 20010925; WO 9845117 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802064

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-10-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-09-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802064 20011213

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI