Global Patent Index - EP 0973646 A2

EP 0973646 A2 2000-01-26 - MULTI-COLOUR PRINTING UNIT IN THE FORM OF INK AND LASER PRINTING UNITS

Title (en)

MULTI-COLOUR PRINTING UNIT IN THE FORM OF INK AND LASER PRINTING UNITS

Title (de)

MEHRFARBEN-DRUCKWERK IN FORM VON TINTEN- UND LASERDRUCKWERKEN

Title (fr)

BLOC D'IMPRESSION MULTICOLORE SOUS FORME DE BLOCS D'IMPRESSION LASER ET A ENCRE

Publication

EP 0973646 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98930636 A

Priority

  • DE 9801010 W
  • DE 19714951 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845123A2] The invention relates to a sheet-fed printing press, comprising at least one high performance printing unit, especially a laser printing unit, and several ink jet printing units (12) which are each situated on one of several parallel sheet conveying channels, said sheet conveying channels being connected to a shared sheet input channel on the input side via sheet guides (W1 to W7) and to several sheet temporary storage devices (14, 16) on the output side. Said sheet temporary storage devices are connected in turn to a shared sheet output channel on the output side. The at least one high-performance printing unit is connected to the shared sheet input channel of the ink jet printing unit (12) or to the shared sheet output channel of the sheet temporary storage device (14, 16). The inventive sheet-fed printing press and a rotary printing press to which the invention also relates enable quick, problem-free and economical multicolour printing and are simple and economical to produce.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 3/50; B41J 2/01; B41J 2/435; B41J 11/00; B41J 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 3/54 (2006.01); B41J 11/46 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 15/00 (2006.01); B41J 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2013.01); B41J 3/54 (2013.01); B41J 3/546 (2013.01); B41J 11/46 (2013.01); B41J 13/00 (2013.01); B41J 15/00 (2013.01); B41J 15/005 (2013.01); B41J 15/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845123A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845123 A2 19981015; WO 9845123 A3 19981230; DE 19714951 A1 19981112; DE 19714951 C2 19990415; EP 0973646 A2 20000126; EP 0973646 B1 20021002; EP 1236570 A1 20020904; US 2001038767 A1 20011108; US 6305858 B1 20011023; US 6655275 B2 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100408

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100408

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805807 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB