Global Patent Index - EP 0973649 A4

EP 0973649 A4 2000-07-05 - INK JET RECORDING MEDIUM

Title (en)

INK JET RECORDING MEDIUM

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM

Title (fr)

SUPPORT D'IMAGERIE POUR PROCESSUS A JET D'ENCRE

Publication

EP 0973649 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97922368 A

Priority

US 9706617 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847716A1] A medium (10) for ink jet imaging includes a bottom layer (20) of material having a very high absorption for the polar, solvent component of an ink jet imaging ink, together with a top layer (22) of image receptor material disposed in fluid communication therewith. The bottom layer (20) has a very high affinity for the solvent component of the ink and tends to draw the solvent from a body of ink thereby preventing image spread and producing a localized, highly saturated image.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00; B41J 2/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9847716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847716 A1 19981029; AU 2806197 A 19981113; EP 0973649 A1 20000126; EP 0973649 A4 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1022873

2002-06-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020203

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991104

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL