Global Patent Index - EP 0973737 A4

EP 0973737 A4 2000-04-26 - EFFICIENT SYNTHESIS OF A CHIRAL MEDIATOR

Title (en)

EFFICIENT SYNTHESIS OF A CHIRAL MEDIATOR

Title (de)

EFFIZIENTE SYNTHESE EINES CHIRALEN MEDIATORS

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE EFFICACE D'UN MEDIATEUR CHIRAL

Publication

EP 0973737 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98903459 A

Priority

  • GB 9704194 A
  • GB 9710393 A
  • US 9800578 W
  • US 3492697 P
  • US 4202197 P
  • US 4516797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9830540A1] An efficient method for the quantitative preparation and isolation of a compound of formula (I) or its enantiomer, a chiral mediator used in enantioselective synthesis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 205/04; C07D 209/44; C07D 211/14; C07D 221/04; C07D 221/14; C07D 295/08; C07D 295/088; C07D 295/092; C07D 295/096

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/08 (2006.01); C07D 205/04 (2006.01); C07D 209/44 (2006.01); C07D 221/06 (2006.01); C07D 221/14 (2006.01); C07D 295/084 (2006.01); C07D 295/096 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 221/14 (2013.01); C07D 205/04 (2013.01); C07D 209/44 (2013.01); C07D 295/092 (2013.01); C07D 295/096 (2013.01); C07B 2200/07 (2013.01); C07C 2102/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9630339 A1 19961003 - PFIZER [US], et al
  • [DA] WO 9637457 A1 19961128 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [A] AZIZOV A M ET AL: "Complete alkylation of 2-aminoethanol in the presence of sodium hydroxide", AZERB. KHIM. ZH. (AZKZAU,00052531);1985; (6); PP.61-5, Azerb. Inzh.-Stroit. Inst.;Baku; USSR (SU), XP002131296
  • [XY] BROWN E ET AL: "Asymmetric reductions of ketones using lithium aluminum hydride modified with N,N-dialkyl derivatives of (R)-(-)-2-aminobutan-1-ol", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY (TASYE3,09574166);1991; VOL.2 (5); PP.339-42, Fac. Sci.;Lab. Synth. Org.; Le Mans; 72017; Fr. (FR), XP000872930
  • [Y] PIERCE M E ET AL: "Practical Asymmetric Synthesis of Efavirenz (DMP 266), an HIV-1 Reverse Transcriptase Inhibitor", J. ORG. CHEM. (JOCEAH,00223263);1998; VOL.63 (23); PP.8536-8543, The DuPont Pharmaceuticals Company;Chemical Process R&D Department Process Research Facility; Deepwater; 08023-0999; NJ; USA (US), XP000881116
  • See also references of WO 9830540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9830540 A1 19980716; AU 6022598 A 19980803; AU 732430 B2 20010426; CA 2276074 A1 19980716; EP 0973737 A1 20000126; EP 0973737 A4 20000426; JP 2000507970 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 205/04 A, 7C 07D 209/44 B, 7C 07D 211/14 B, 7C 07D 221/04 B, 7C 07D 295/088 B, 7C 07D 295/092 B, 7C 07D 295/096 B, 7C 07D 295/08 B, 7C 07D 221/14 B

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990810

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE