Global Patent Index - EP 0973749 A1

EP 0973749 A1 2000-01-26 - 4-AMINOALKOXY-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS DOPAMINE AUTORECEPTOR (D2) AGONISTS

Title (en)

4-AMINOALKOXY-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS DOPAMINE AUTORECEPTOR (D2) AGONISTS

Title (de)

4-AMINOALKOXY-1H-BENZIMIDAZOL DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS DOPAMIN AUTOREZEPTOR (D2) AGONISTEN

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE 4-AMINOALCOXY-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGONISTES DES AUTORECEPTEURS DE LA DOPAMINE (D 2?)

Publication

EP 0973749 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902513 A

Priority

  • US 9800613 W
  • US 80127697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835945A1] This invention relates to D2 dopaminergic compounds of formula (I), wherein R<1> is hydrogen, trifluoromethyl, pentafluoroethyl, heptafluoropropyl, straight-chain or branched alkyl group having up to 6 carbons or benzyl optionally substituted by one to three substituents selected from halogen, amino, nitro, hydroxy, C1-C6 alkoxy; R<2> is hydrogen or C1-C6 alkyl. R3 is hydrogen, straight-chain or branched alkyl group having up to 10 carbon atoms, cyclohexylmethyl, -(CH2)mAr, where Ar is phenyl, thienyl, furanyl, or pyridinyl, each optionally substituted by one to two substituents selected from halogen, C1-C6 alkoxy, trifluoromethyl or C1-C6 alkyl; or NR<2>R<3> is 1,2,3,4-tetrahydroquinolin-1-yl or 1,2,3,4-tetrahydroisoquinolin-2-yl; Y = halogen, lower alkyl, amino, and lower alkoxy; n = 1-5; or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof. These D2 dopaminergic compounds are useful in the treatment of schizophrenia, Parkinson's disease, Tourette's syndrome, and drug or alcohol addiction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 235/06; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/47; C07D 235/08; C07D 235/10; C07D 401/12; C07D 409/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4725 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/30 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 235/06 (2006.01); C07D 235/08 (2006.01); C07D 235/10 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 235/06 (2013.01); C07D 235/08 (2013.01); C07D 235/10 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835945A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835945 A1 19980820; AR 011136 A1 20000802; AU 5915398 A 19980908; AU 746717 B2 20020502; BR 9807701 A 20000502; CA 2278700 A1 19980820; CN 1252793 A 20000510; EP 0973749 A1 20000126; HU 0001302 A2 20010528; HU 0001302 A3 20010730; IL 131158 D0 20010128; JP 2001509814 A 20010724; KR 20000071129 A 20001125; NZ 336969 A 20010330; TW 513415 B 20021211; ZA 9801309 B 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1024919

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990618

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990618;LT PAYMENT 19990618;LV PAYMENT 19990618;RO PAYMENT 19990618;SI PAYMENT 19990618