Global patent index - EP 0973753 A2

EP 0973753 A2 2000-01-26 - 4,4-DISUBSTITUTED-3,4-DIHYDRO-2(1H)-QUINAZOLINONES USEFUL AS HIV REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

4,4-DISUBSTITUTED-3,4-DIHYDRO-2(1H)-QUINAZOLINONES USEFUL AS HIV REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

4,4-DISUBSTITUIERTE 3,4-DIHYDRO-2(1H)-CHINAZOLINONE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS HIV-REVERSE-TRANSCRIPTASE-HEMMER

Title (fr)

4,4-DISUBSTITUEES-3,4-DIHYDRO-2(1H)-QUINAZOLINONES UTILISEES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA TRANSCRIPTASE INVERSE DU VIH

Publication

EP 0973753 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98913401 A

Priority

  • US 9806733 W
  • US 83854097 A
  • US 7132298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845276A2] The present invention relates to 4,4-disubstituted-3,4-dihydro-2(1H)-quinazolines of formula (I), or stereoisomeric forms, stereoisomeric mixtures, or pharmaceutically acceptable salt forms thereof, which are useful as inhibitors of HIV reverse transcriptase, and to pharmaceutical compositions and diagnostic kits comprising the same, and methods of using the same for treating viral infection or as an assay standard or reagent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/80; A61K 31/505; C07D 401/06; C07D 403/06; C07D 405/06; C07D 409/06; C07D 413/06; C07D 417/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 239/80 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 403/06 (2006.01); C07D 405/06 (2006.01); C07D 409/06 (2006.01); C07D 413/06 (2006.01); C07D 417/06 (2006.01); C07D 491/056 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 239/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845276A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845276 A2 19981015; WO 9845276 A3 19990114; AR 012340 A1 20001018; AU 6796098 A 19981030; AU 734928 B2 20010628; BR 9808513 A 20000523; CA 2284996 A1 19981015; CN 1252063 A 20000503; EA 001991 B1 20011022; EE 9900452 A 20000417; EP 0973753 A2 20000126; HR P980143 A2 19990228; HU 0001446 A2 20010528; HU 0001446 A3 20011128; IL 132188 D0 20010319; JP 2002504095 A 20020205; KR 20010006146 A 20010126; NO 314936 B1 20030616; NO 994904 A 19991201; NO 994904 D0 19991008; NZ 500592 A 20010928; PL 336305 A1 20000619; SK 137899 A3 20000516; TW 587078 B 20040511

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051107

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA COMPANY

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA COMPANY

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19990923;LV PAYMENT 19990923;RO PAYMENT 19990923;SI PAYMENT 19990923