Global patent index - EP 0973797 A1

EP 0973797 A1 2000-01-26 - PEPTIDE COMPOSITIONS WHICH INDUCE IMMUNE TOLERANCE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

PEPTIDE COMPOSITIONS WHICH INDUCE IMMUNE TOLERANCE AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

PEPTIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON IMMUNTOLERANZ UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER NUTZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE PETPIDES ENTRA NANT UNE TOLERANCE IMMUNITAIRE ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0973797 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97923445 A

Priority

  • US 9706799 W
  • US 63843796 A
  • US 84497897 A
  • US 5784896 P

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 7/00; A61K 38/04; C07K 14/705

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0973797 A1 20000126; EP 0973797 A4 20020116; JP 2002515873 A 20020528

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1027358

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040818

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-01-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20011203

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07K 14/705 A, 7A 61K 38/04 B

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981118

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE