Global patent index - EP 0973800 A1

EP 0973800 A1 2000-01-26 - NOVEL RECEPTOR

Title (en)

NOVEL RECEPTOR

Title (de)

NEUARTIGER REZEPTOR

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU RECEPTEUR

Publication

EP 0973800 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946142 A

Priority

  • AU 9800805 W
  • AU PO938697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915551A1] The invention provides isolated polynucleotide molecules encoding a novel G-protein-coupled receptor (designated TSR32). These isolated polynucleotide molecules can be used to express the receptor in cells which can then be used to screen compounds for agonist and antagonist activity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 7/06; A01K 67/027; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/12; C12P 21/02; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/04 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/723 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [T] LIU M ET AL: "GPR56, a novel secretin-like human G-protein-coupled receptor gene" GENOMICS, vol. 55, no. 3, 1 February 1999 (1999-02-01), pages 296-305, XP002137722
  • See also references of WO 9915551A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915551 A1 19990401; AU PO938697 D0 19971016; CA 2271700 A1 19990401; EP 0973800 A1 20000126; EP 0973800 A4 20011004; JP 2001513653 A 20010904

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: G2 THERAPIES LIMITED

2003-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: G2 THERAPIES LIMITED

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020513

2001-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990616

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE