Global patent index - EP 0973838 A1

EP 0973838 A1 2000-01-26 - STRONGLY ADHERENT FILM FORMING COMPOSITIONS WITH LOW COEFFICIENT OF FRICTION

Title (en)

STRONGLY ADHERENT FILM FORMING COMPOSITIONS WITH LOW COEFFICIENT OF FRICTION

Title (de)

STARK ANHAFTENDE FILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGEM REIBUNGSKOEFFIZIENT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS FILMOGENES FORTEMENT ADHESIVES ET A FAIBLE COEFFICIEHT DE FRICTION

Publication

EP 0973838 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914644 A

Priority

  • US 9807122 W
  • US 84009997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846687A1] A coating material (20) comprising a mixture of a thermosetting resin, polytetrafluoroethylene, a member of the polyolefin group consisting of polyethylene, a copolymer of polyethylene and polypropylene, and a combination of polyethylene and a copolymer of polyethylene and polypropylene, in a solvent, wherein said solvent being volatile and having the property of dissolving said resin, is produced and applied to a metal substrate (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 123/00; B32B 15/04; B32B 15/08; C10M 107/38; C10M 107/54; C10M 111/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 5/00 (2006.01); C09D 127/18 (2006.01); C09D 157/00 (2006.01); C09D 161/10 (2006.01); C10M 111/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C08L 23/02 (2006.01); C08L 23/06 (2006.01); C08L 23/10 (2006.01); C08L 23/16 (2006.01); C08L 23/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 111/04 (2013.01); C10M 169/044 (2013.01); C08L 23/02 (2013.01); C08L 23/06 (2013.01); C08L 23/10 (2013.01); C08L 23/16 (2013.01); C08L 23/20 (2013.01); C10M 2201/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/05 (2013.01); C10M 2201/053 (2013.01); C10M 2201/06 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0603 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0613 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0623 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0653 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0663 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0803 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0853 (2013.01); C10M 2201/086 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0863 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0873 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1023 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1053 (2013.01); C10M 2201/123 (2013.01); C10M 2201/18 (2013.01); C10M 2203/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/065 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/022 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0225 (2013.01); C10M 2205/024 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0245 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0265 (2013.01); C10M 2205/028 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/0215 (2013.01); C10M 2207/08 (2013.01); C10M 2207/085 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2825 (2013.01); C10M 2207/285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2855 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2209/101 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1013 (2013.01); C10M 2209/102 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1023 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2213/00 (2013.01); C10M 2213/02 (2013.01); C10M 2213/023 (2013.01); C10M 2213/043 (2013.01); C10M 2213/0606 (2013.01); C10M 2213/062 (2013.01); C10M 2213/0623 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0403 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0415 (2013.01); C10M 2217/042 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0425 (2013.01); C10M 2217/043 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0435 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0443 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0453 (2013.01); C10M 2217/0465 (2013.01); C10N 2250/121 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 111/04 + C10M 103/04 + C10M 103/06 + C10M 105/06 + C10M 105/12 + C10M 105/20 + C10M 105/36 + C10M 107/04 + C10M 107/06 + C10M 107/08 + C10M 107/32 + C10M 107/38 + C10M 107/44
  2. C10M 169/044 + C10M 107/32 + C10M 107/38 + C10M 107/44 + C10M 125/00 + C10M 125/04 + C10M 129/72 + C10M 143/02 + C10M 143/04 + C10M 143/06

Citation (search report)

  • [XP] US 5624978 A
  • [AD] US 3979351 A
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 198742 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A12, AN 1987-294528 XP002137017 & JP 62 205177 A (NIPPON OIL SEAL IND CO LTD), 9 September 1987 (1987-09-09)
  • See also references of WO 9846687A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846687 A1 19981022; AU 6894998 A 19981111; CA 2286211 A1 19981022; CA 2286211 C 20070619; EP 0973838 A1 20000126; EP 0973838 A4 20000705; JP 2001526713 A 20011218; JP 4757362 B2 20110824

INPADOC legal status

2013-11-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025345

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030805

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020626

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7C 09D 127/18 A, 7C 09D 123/00 B, 7C 10M 107/38 B, 7C 10M 107/54 B, 7C 10M 111/04 B, 7B 32B 15/04 B, 7B 32B 15/08 B, 7C 09D 127/18 J, 7C 09D 123:02 J, 7C 09D 161:04 J

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE