Global patent index - EP 0973844 A1

EP 0973844 A1 2000-01-26 - COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING CONE TILT ANGLE IN MIXTURES OF SMECTIC LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING CONE TILT ANGLE IN MIXTURES OF SMECTIC LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIEREN DES KEGELNEIGUNGSWINKELS IN MISCHUNGEN VON SMEKTISCHEN FLÜSSIGKRISTALLVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE L'ANGLE D'INCLINAISON DU CONE DANS DES MELANGES DE COMPOSES DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES SMECTIQUES

Publication

EP 0973844 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910468 A

Priority

  • US 9805270 W
  • US 82775397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846697A1] A process for controlling the cone tilt angle of a tilted smectic liquid crystal composition comprises the step of combining (a) at least one liquid crystal composition comprising at least one smectic or latent smectic liquid crystal compound comprising (i) an aliphatic fluorocarbon terminal portion comprising a terminal fluoroalkyl or fluoroether group and an alkylene group having at least two carbon atoms and containing at least one catenary ether oxygen atom, (ii) an aliphatic hydrocarbon terminal portion, and (iii) a central core connecting the terminal portions, wherein the alkylene group of the aliphatic fluorocarbon terminal portion is directly linked to the central core by a moiety selected from the group consisting of a covalent bond, -CH=CH-, and -CC-; and (b) at least one liquid crystal composition comprising at least one smectic or latent smectic liquid crystal compound; with the provisos that at least one of the compositions (a) and (b) comprises at least one chiral liquid crystal compound and that the combining of compositions (a) and (b) provides an optically active, tilted chiral smectic liquid crystal composition. The process enables control of cone tilt angle and thereby control of the brightness characteristics of liquid crystal display devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 19/04; C07D 239/26; C07D 239/34; C09K 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/13 (2006.01); C07D 239/26 (2006.01); C07D 239/34 (2006.01); C09K 19/04 (2006.01); C09K 19/06 (2006.01); C09K 19/34 (2006.01); C09K 19/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/26 (2013.01); C09K 19/04 (2013.01); C09K 19/3469 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846697A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846697 A1 19981022; CN 1252086 A 20000503; DE 69815330 D1 20030710; DE 69815330 T2 20040429; EP 0973844 A1 20000126; EP 0973844 B1 20030604; JP 2001520687 A 20011030; TW 550423 B 20030901; US 5855812 A 19990105

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080318

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080318

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69815330

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030710

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL