Global Patent Index - EP 0973858 A1

EP 0973858 A1 2000-01-26 - DETERGENT BARS COMPRISING ADJUVANT POWDERS FOR DELIVERING BENEFIT AGENT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF SAID BARS

Title (en)

DETERGENT BARS COMPRISING ADJUVANT POWDERS FOR DELIVERING BENEFIT AGENT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF SAID BARS

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSMITTELSTÜCKE ENTHALTEND PULVERFÖRMIGE WIRKSTOFFE, UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PAINS DETERGENTS CONTENANT DES POUDRES ADJUVANTES POUR LIBERER UN AGENT BENEFIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE CES PAINS

Publication

EP 0973858 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904167 A

Priority

  • EP 9800528 W
  • US 82150297 A
  • US 82150197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842814A1] Adjuvant powder compositions contain a benefit agent or agents and which powder compositions are used in detergent bar compositions to enhance delivery of the benefit agent. The carriers used to form adjuvants must have melting point high enough to survive spray-drying process. Specifically, the invention relates to a bar compositions comprising (A) about 1 % to 30 % powder comprising: (a) 1 % to 70 % by wt. powder benefit agent; (b) 15 % to 98 % by wt. powder carrier; (c) 1 % to 10 % by wt. powder water; and (d) 0 % to 30 % by wt. powder deposition/processing aid (e.g., surfactant, cationic polymer and/or hydrophilic polymer); and (B) 99 % to 70 % chips comprising 5 % to 90 % of a surfactant system wherein the surfactant is selected from the group consisting of soap, anionic surfactant, nonionic surfactant, amphoteric surfactant, cationic surfactant and mixtures thereof. The present invention also provides a process for making bars wherein (A) and (B) are separately prepared; wherein (a), (b), (c) and optional (d) are mixed at 40 DEG to 80 DEG C; wherein the mixture of (a) and (b) is spray dried at 80 DEG C to 200 DEG C at a pressure of 0.10 to 0.30 MPa; and wherein (A) and (B) are mixed, plodded, and extruded into a final bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/37; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/65 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01); C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/18 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/38 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 3/384 (2006.01); C11D 9/22 (2006.01); C11D 9/24 (2006.01); C11D 9/26 (2006.01); C11D 9/40 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/006 (2013.01); C11D 3/18 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/227 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/373 (2013.01); C11D 3/3769 (2013.01); C11D 3/38 (2013.01); C11D 3/382 (2013.01); C11D 3/384 (2013.01); C11D 9/225 (2013.01); C11D 9/24 (2013.01); C11D 9/262 (2013.01); C11D 9/40 (2013.01); C11D 1/123 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9842814A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9842814 A1 19981001; AR 012088 A1 20000927; AU 6214898 A 19981020; AU 736652 B2 20010802; BR 9808284 A 20000516; CA 2282336 A1 19981001; CA 2282336 C 20070522; CN 1137981 C 20040211; CN 1255942 A 20000607; CZ 296195 B6 20060215; CZ 9903351 A3 20001213; DE 69816058 D1 20030807; DE 69816058 T2 20031224; EP 0973858 A1 20000126; EP 0973858 B1 20030702; ES 2202811 T3 20040401; HK 1025119 A1 20040116; ID 23412 A 20000420; IN 189608 B 20030329; JP 2001518100 A 20011009; KR 100498944 B1 20050704; KR 20010005494 A 20010115; PL 188422 B1 20050131; PL 335807 A1 20000522; RU 2188854 C2 20020910

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070123

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080124

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202811 T3

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816058 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990823

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT