Global Patent Index - EP 0973866 A1

EP 0973866 A1 2000-01-26 - ADENOVIRUS E1-COMPLEMENTING CELL LINES

Title (en)

ADENOVIRUS E1-COMPLEMENTING CELL LINES

Title (de)

ADENOVIRUS E1-KOMPLEMENTIERENDE ZELLINIEN

Title (fr)

LIGNEES CELLULAIRES DE COMPLEMENTATION DE LA REGION E1 D'UN ADENOVIRUS

Publication

EP 0973866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908661 A

Priority

  • US 9803473 W
  • US 81003997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839411A1] A new series of helper cell lines for the complementation, amplification, and controlled attenuation of E1-deleted adenovirus are disclosed in the present invention. These cell lines are advantageous because they can complement adenovirus E1 genedeletions without production of replication competent adenovirus (RCA), thus making them safer for the large-scale production of adenovirus stock for use in human genetherapy trials. A preferred embodiment is an A549E1 cell line that contains only the Ad5 E1 DNA sequences sufficient for complementation of E1-deleted adenoviral vectors without sequences that overlap with the adenovirus vector. In another aspect, the present invention embodies methods for the production of second generation A549-E1 complementing cell lines that, in addition to producing E1, also produce proteins required for further manipulation of adenoviral vectors. A preferred embodiment is an A549E1 cell line with DNA sequences that encode a polypeptide sufficient for packaging attenuation of E1-deleted helper virus, in order to enrich for packaging of mini-adenovirus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/861 (2006.01); C12N 15/864 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 7/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10343 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10345 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10352 (2013.01); C12N 2750/14143 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839411 A1 19980911; CA 2283253 A1 19980911; EP 0973866 A1 20000126; EP 0973866 A4 20000419; JP 2000509614 A 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050210

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENSTAR THERAPEUTICS CORPORATION

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AYARES, DAVID

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALEMANY, RAMON

2003-03-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHANG, WEI-WEI

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-04-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 5/00 A, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12N 15/64 B, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 12N 5/22 B, 7C 12N 15/86 B

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE