Global Patent Index - EP 0973911 A1

EP 0973911 A1 2000-01-26 - LIVE VACCINE COMPRISING MUTANT MSBB AND/OR HTRB GENES

Title (en)

LIVE VACCINE COMPRISING MUTANT MSBB AND/OR HTRB GENES

Title (de)

LEBENDIMPFSTOFFE MIT MUTIERTEM MSBB UND/ODER HTRB GEN

Title (fr)

VACCIN VIVANT COMPRENANT GENES MUTANTS MSBB ET/OU HTRB

Publication

EP 0973911 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902105 A

Priority

  • GB 9800291 W
  • GB 9701886 A
  • GB 9701887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9833923A1] Nucleic acid for a mutant msbB or htrB gene derivable from Salmonella which results in loss of an msbB or htrB encoded protein, respectively, or loss of function of the protein, which in turn results in a lipid A molecule having reduced toxicity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/255 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12R 1/42 (2013.01); C07K 14/255 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9833923A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9833923 A1 19980806; AU 5873498 A 19980825; EP 0973911 A1 20000126

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/02 A

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MASKELL, DUNCAN, JOHN

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DOUGAN, GORDON,IMPERIAL COL. OF SCI., TECH.& M

2005-01-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LIVE VACCINE COMPRISING MUTANT MSBB AND/OR HTRB GENES

2004-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LIVE VACCINNE COMPRISING MUTANT MSBB AND/OR HTRB GENES

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030730

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MUTANT MSBB OR HTRB GENES

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE