Global Patent Index - EP 0973946 A1

EP 0973946 A1 2000-01-26 - BIOLOGICAL ASSAY FOR TESTING THE CARCINOGENIC PROPERTIES OF A SUBSTANCE

Title (en)

BIOLOGICAL ASSAY FOR TESTING THE CARCINOGENIC PROPERTIES OF A SUBSTANCE

Title (de)

BIOLOGISCHER ASSAY ZUM TESTEN KARZINOGENER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER SUBSTANZ

Title (fr)

ANALYSE BIOLOGIQUE DESTINEE A ANALYSER LES PROPRIETES CANCEROGENES D'UNE SUBSTANCE

Publication

EP 0973946 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917309 A

Priority

  • GB 9800869 W
  • GB 9707141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845476A1] An assay for testing the carcinogenic properties of a test substance comprising: (i) introducing into cells a reporter gene expression vector comprising a repetitive DNA sequence which exhibits instability in cancer cells, whereby instability of the repetitive DNA sequence affects expression of the reporter gene; (ii) exposing the resulting cells to the test substance; and (iii) determining whether the test substance is carcinogenic or anticarcinogenic by comparing the frequency of reporter gene expression in the resulting cells with the frequency of reporter gene expression in cells which have not been exposed to the test substance. The invention also provides expression vectors suitable for use in the assay methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6897 (2013.01); G01N 33/5017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845476A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845476 A1 19981015; AU 7055698 A 19981030; EP 0973946 A1 20000126; GB 9707141 D0 19970528

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHWEIZER, MICHAEL

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LARKIN,KENNETH, JOHN

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011214

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE INSTITUTE OF FOOD RESEARCH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE