Global patent index - EP 0973959 A2

EP 0973959 A2 2000-01-26 - COATING METHOD FOR ELONGATED METAL BLANKS

Title (en)

COATING METHOD FOR ELONGATED METAL BLANKS

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN LÄNGLICHER, METALLISCHER ROHLINGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT D'EBAUCHES METALLIQUES ALLONGEES

Publication

EP 0973959 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98922654 A

Priority

  • DE 19715208 A
  • EP 9802000 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846806A2] The invention relates to a method based on superfinishing for coating elongated metal blanks. Said blanks have at least two axially aligned sections with varying cross-sections, wherein particles of a hard substance protruding from the surface of the coating are embedded into a metal lining in a chemical electroplating bath on the surface of a first segment provided with indentations or the like. The exposed surfaces of a second section remain substantially devoid of hard substance particles. A plurality of blanks is thus freely circulated in a rotating drum in a dispersion which is suspended in the electroplating liquid so that the hard substance particles adhering to the exposed surfaces can be removed once again by rubbing the blanks against each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/16; B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01); C23C 18/16 (2006.01); C23C 18/52 (2006.01); C25D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/002 (2013.01); C23C 18/1653 (2013.01); C23C 18/1662 (2013.01); C23C 18/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846806A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846806 A2 19981022; WO 9846806 A3 19990311; AU 7522698 A 19981111; CN 1121512 C 20030917; CN 1256718 A 20000614; DK 0973959 T3 20020211; EP 0973959 A2 20000126; EP 0973959 B1 20011010; ES 2162444 T3 20011216; JP 2001518981 A 20011016; JP 4094681 B2 20080604; US 6299750 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801691

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050407

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-12-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-11-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Document Number: 98922654.3

- Format of ref. document F/P: F

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-04-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2162444

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59801691

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011115

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE