Global patent index - EP 0973968 A2

EP 0973968 A2 2000-01-26 - WASHING METHOD TO ACHIEVE A SUPERIOR WASHING PERFORMANCE BY INTERMITTENT AND VARIABLE OSCILLATING DRUM MOVEMENTS

Title (en)

WASHING METHOD TO ACHIEVE A SUPERIOR WASHING PERFORMANCE BY INTERMITTENT AND VARIABLE OSCILLATING DRUM MOVEMENTS

Title (de)

WASCHVERFAHREN ZUM ERZIELEN EINER BESSEREN WASCHLEISTUNG DURCH PERIODISCHE UND VARIABLE OSZILLIERENDE TROMMELBEWEGUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LAVAGE AMELIORANT LE RENDEMENT DU LAVAGE GRACE A DES MOUVEMENTS INTERMITTENTS ET VARIABLE D'OSCILLATION DU TAMBOUR

Publication

EP 0973968 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97950572 A

Priority

  • TR 9700025 W
  • TR 9601081 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9829594A2] The present invention is related to a method providing an improvement of the washing performance for the washing machines with horizontally positioned tubs and drums by making the drum movements intermittent and with modulating oscillation. In the method according to the present invention, the rotations of any drum used for washing are realized as intermittent and with variable oscillations, the rotational speed of the said drum being increased or reduced with the desired acceleration rate that may be variable and this movement can be stopped at any desired angle thus obtaining the intended falling angles and heights at the desired cylces and by creating the desired velocity differences between water and clothes to be washed, as the result of these movements, the washing performance is improved by means of various drum movements. Said drum movements are realized by means of the washing programmes selected with regard to the type of textile to be washed. While washing wool, the requirement of keeping the material to be washed continuously in water is met using less water by keeping said drum movements between given limit values.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/006 (2013.01); D06F 2204/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9829594A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9829594 A2 19980709; WO 9829594 A3 19981001; AT 239814 T 20030515; AU 5353998 A 19980731; DE 69721834 D1 20030612; DE 69721834 T2 20040408; EP 0973968 A2 20000126; EP 0973968 B1 20030507; ES 2199381 T3 20040216; TR 9601081 A2 19980721

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2199381

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-10-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2003-08-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69721834

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030612

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUENEN, EVREN

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAYA, MEHMET

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PASIN, MERIHATASEHIR BULVARI

2003-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUEZUENGUEC, MUSTAFASEMSETTIN GUENALTAY CAD

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020121

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990727

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990727;LT PAYMENT 19990727;LV PAYMENT 19990727;MK PAYMENT 19990727;RO PAYMENT 19990727;SI PAYMENT 19990727