Global Patent Index - EP 0973973 A1

EP 0973973 A1 2000-01-26 - ROTARY SNOW PLOW

Title (en)

ROTARY SNOW PLOW

Title (de)

SCHNEEFRÄSSCHLEUDER

Title (fr)

TURBO-FRAISEUSE A NEIGE

Publication

EP 0973973 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912189 A

Priority

  • CH 9800143 W
  • CH 89197 A
  • CH 223497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846832A1] The invention relates to a rotary snow plow with an endless screw (18) for feeding the snow into the snow plow and a centrifugal wheel (19) for ejecting said snow. The centrifugal wheel (19) is aligned with the endless screw (18). The centrifugal wheel (19) and the endless screw (18) can be mounted on one shaft (23) so that they rotate with the same angular velocity. The inventive rotary snow plow is characterized by a high degree of efficiency, since the flow of snow does not need to be turned around by 90 degrees, and is particularly suitable for clearing side walls and creating half-pipe pistes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 5/09; E01H 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 4/02 (2006.01); E01H 5/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 4/02 (2013.01); E01H 5/098 (2013.01); E01H 2004/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846832A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846832 A1 19981022; AT 220149 T 20020715; AU 6716298 A 19981111; CA 2287393 A1 19981022; CA 2287393 C 20051025; DE 59804671 D1 20020808; EP 0973973 A1 20000126; EP 0973973 B1 20020703; ES 2178182 T3 20021216; JP 2001520714 A 20011030; JP 3460088 B2 20031027; NO 324800 B1 20071210; NO 995047 A 19991125; NO 995047 D0 19991015; US 6367176 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140417

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140417

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804671

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220149 T

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-12-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804671

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130416

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178182 T3

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804671 20020808

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR IT LI SE

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220149 T 20020715

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR IT LI SE