Global patent index - EP 0973985 A1

EP 0973985 A1 2000-01-26 - LATTICE BEAM FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOBILE CONSTRUCTIONS

Title (en)

LATTICE BEAM FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOBILE CONSTRUCTIONS

Title (de)

GITTERTRÄGER ZUR HERSTELLUNG MOBILER BAUTEN

Title (fr)

POUTRE EN TREILLIS POUR LA FABRICATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS MOBILES

Publication

EP 0973985 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912422 A

Priority

  • DE 19714996 A
  • EP 9801143 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19714996A1] The invention relates to a lattice beam consisting of several parallel metal sections (1, 2, 3) held together by trellis structures (4) running obliquely through said sections. The invention is characterized in that three hollow sections (1, 2, 3) are joined to a beam having an isosceles triangle cross-section. The hollow section at the tip of the triangle and the other hollow sections have hollow chambers (9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14). These chambers are fitted symmetrically in the case of the first hollow section. In the case of the other two hollow sections, the hollow chambers are fitted so as to be mirror-symmetrical to the plane running in the middle between the equal sides. At least some of the hollow chambers of all the hollow profiles have a slit (15) which opens outwards on their outer wall. Thanks to this structure, the lattice beam can be fitted with connectors from known fair and exhibition building systems. Additional elements or decorative plates (17) can also be fitted in simple fashion, the lattice beam thus becoming an aesthetic structural element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/08 (2006.01); E04C 3/40 (2006.01); E04H 1/12 (2006.01); E04B 1/19 (2006.01); E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/1272 (2013.01); E04C 3/08 (2013.01); E04C 3/40 (2013.01); E04B 1/1909 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1927 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1933 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1936 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1951 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1954 (2013.01); E04B 2001/196 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1966 (2013.01); E04B 2001/199 (2013.01); E04B 2001/1993 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2406 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2472 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0486 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0495 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845552A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19714996 A1 19981029; DE 19714996 C2 20010125; AT 238471 T 20030515; CN 1095914 C 20021211; CN 1252115 A 20000503; CN 1302184 C 20070228; CN 1492116 A 20040428; DE 59808072 D1 20030528; DE 59813108 D1 20060223; EP 0973985 A1 20000126; EP 0973985 B1 20030423; EP 1231340 A2 20020814; EP 1231340 A3 20030319; EP 1231340 B1 20051012; ES 2196555 T3 20031216; ES 2247221 T3 20060301; HK 1027142 A1 20030704; HK 1049196 A1 20060707; PL 196451 B1 20080131; PL 336113 A1 20000605; SK 135499 A3 20000612; SK 286207 B6 20080506; WO 9845552 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59808072

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-09-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: OCTANORM-VERTRIEBS-GMBH FUER BAUELEMENTE

- Free Format Text: OCTANORM-VERTRIEBS-GMBH FUER BAUELEMENTE#RAIFFEISENSTRASSE 39#70794 FILDERSTADT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- OCTANORM-VERTRIEBS-GMBH FUER BAUELEMENTE#RAIFFEISENSTRASSE 39#70794 FILDERSTADT (DE)

2007-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCTANORM-VERTRIEBS-G.M.B.H. FUR BAUELEMENTE

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-04-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2196555

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0973985E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59808072

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030528

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991001

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE