Global patent index - EP 0973992 A1

EP 0973992 A1 2000-01-26 - SUBSURFACE PROBE SYSTEM FOR CHEMICAL AND MINERAL EXPLORATION

Title (en)

SUBSURFACE PROBE SYSTEM FOR CHEMICAL AND MINERAL EXPLORATION

Title (de)

UNTERGRUNDSONDE FÜR CHEMISCHE UND KOHLENWASSERSTOFF-ERKUNDUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SONDE SOUTERRAINE POUR EXPLORATION CHIMIQUE ET MINERALE

Publication

EP 0973992 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97922678 A

Priority

  • US 9707613 W
  • US 64621196 A
  • US 80402297 A
  • US 84594597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837301A1] The present invention is a subsurface probe system (1-3) for providing information about the material below a surface. The probe includes a housing (2) and a means (1) for heating the surrounding material. The heat melts the surrounding material to allow the probe to descend. The probe provides information to the surface by a wire or other means (3, 21, 22, 30) for carrying information. The wire (3, 21, 22, 30) is stored on the probe and deploys as the probe descends.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/15; E21B 47/00; E21B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/15 (2006.01); E21B 7/26 (2006.01); E21B 47/12 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/12 (2013.01); E21B 7/15 (2013.01); E21B 7/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4651834 A
  • [A] US 3115194 A 19631224 - ADAMS WILLIAM M
  • [A] JOSEPH W . NEUDECKER: "Subterrene Instrumentation Requirements" ISA TRANSACTIONS, vol. 13, no. 3, 1974, pages 199-201, XP002125889
  • See also references of WO 9837301A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837301 A1 19980827; AU 2828497 A 19980909; AU 718865 B2 20000420; BR 9709061 A 19990803; CA 2253227 A1 19980827; EP 0973992 A1 20000126; EP 0973992 A4 20000426; NO 985190 A 19981106; NO 985190 D0 19981106

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020902

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 7/15 A, 7E 21B 7/26 B, 7E 21B 47/12 B

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981116

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL