Global patent index - EP 0973996 A1

EP 0973996 A1 2000-01-26 - DOWNHOLE MONITORING METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (en)

DOWNHOLE MONITORING METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR BOHRLOCHÜBERWACHUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'OBSERVATION EN FOND DE PUITS

Publication

EP 0973996 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922712 A

Priority

  • EP 98922712 A
  • EP 9802187 W
  • EP 97201092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0870900A1] A method and device are provided for monitoring the interfaces between and other physical characteristics of fluids in the pore spaces of an underground formation. The device (4) comprises a sleeve (5) around which, when in use, an annular measuring chamber (8) is formed which is in fluid communication with the pore spaces of the surrounding formation but which is hydraulically isolated from other parts of the wellbore of a production or other well in which the device (4) is mounted. An array of capacitor or other sensors (11) is mounted in the measuring chamber (8) for measuring the interfaces between, or other physical characteristics of, the fluids in the measuring chamber (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/04 (2012.01); E21B 47/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/102 (2013.01); E21B 47/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0870900 A1 19981014; AU 7525598 A 19981030; EP 0973996 A1 20000126; EP 0973996 B1 20020814; WO 9845574 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-03-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040302

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030502

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-04-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030415

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-10-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69807202

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020919

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IT NL

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990831

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IT NL