Global patent index - EP 0973998 A1

EP 0973998 A1 2000-01-26 - METHOD FOR COOLING A TURBINE BLADE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR COOLING A TURBINE BLADE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REFROIDIR UNE AUBE DE TURBINE

Publication

EP 0973998 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924039 A

Priority

  • DE 9800874 W
  • DE 19714285 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845577A1] The invention relates to a turbine blade (1) with an outer wall (3), wherein at least one cooling chamber (20) is thermally coupled to said wall (3) and provided with a coolant inlet (15) and outlet (16). Both the coolant supply (22) and the coolant discharge (23) are in fluidic connection with the cooling chamber (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2260/201 (2013.01); F05D 2260/202 (2013.01); F05D 2260/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845577A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845577 A1 19981015; EP 0973998 A1 20000126; EP 0973998 B1 20010919; JP 2001521599 A 20011106; JP 4170400 B2 20081022; KR 20010006106 A 20010126

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-09-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59801529

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20011025

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-09-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-09-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010309

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE