Global patent index - EP 0974000 A1

EP 0974000 A1 2000-01-26 - MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH TWO INLET VALVES AND TWO OUTLET VALVES

Title (en)

MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH TWO INLET VALVES AND TWO OUTLET VALVES

Title (de)

MEHRZYLINDER-BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT ZWEI EINLASS- UND ZWEI AUSLASSVENTILEN

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A CYLINDRES MULTIPLES COMPORTANT DEUX SOUPAPES D'ADMISSION ET DEUX SOUPAPES D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 0974000 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921441 A

Priority

  • AT 60697 A
  • EP 9802034 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845579A1] The invention relates to a multicylinder internal combustion engine with two inlet valves and two outlet valves (12, 11), the outlet valves (11) being located on one side of an internal combustion engine and the inlet valves (12) being located on the other side. The outlet valves (11) and the inlet valves (12) are actuated by a camshaft via inlet rocker arms (4) and outlet rocker arms (5). In order to reduce the size of the cylinder heads (1) and the rocker housing (2), the inlet rocker arm (4) and the outlet rocker arm (5) are forked. Each forked rocker arm (4, 5) actuates two similar valves (12, 11) per cylinder (13). The axes (4a, 5a) of the inlet rocker arms (4) or outlet rocker arms (5) are staggered in relation to each other or preferably overlap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F01L 3/10 (2006.01); F01L 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845579A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845579 A1 19981015; AT 410242 B 20030325; AT A60697 A 20020715; CN 1095027 C 20021127; CN 1239532 A 19991222; DE 59806629 D1 20030123; EP 0974000 A1 20000126; EP 0974000 B1 20021211; JP 2000513068 A 20001003; US 6205966 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59806629

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030123

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990803

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE