Global patent index - EP 0974001 A1

EP 0974001 A1 2000-01-26 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

ABGASVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0974001 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98920605 A

Priority

  • FR 9800728 W
  • FR 9704411 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762045A1] The invention concerns an internal engine exhaust device comprising a conduit element (1) through which the exhaust gases flow out, said conduit element (1) including a housing (2) for mounting a measurement sensor such as an oxygen probe, characterised in that said housing (2) is formed by a hole extended by an insert produced directly through said conduit element (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/00; B21C 37/29; F16L 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/29 (2006.01); F01N 13/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/008 (2013.01); B21C 37/298 (2013.01); B21J 5/066 (2013.01); F01N 2530/04 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49398 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845584A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762045 A1 19981016; FR 2762045 B1 19990604; DE 69824285 D1 20040708; DE 69824285 T2 20050602; EP 0974001 A1 20000126; EP 0974001 B1 20040602; ES 2217553 T3 20041101; JP 2001519004 A 20011016; JP 2008274959 A 20081113; US 2001025419 A1 20011004; US 6848438 B2 20050201; WO 9845584 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-02-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FLOWDRILL B.V.PATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-04-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-04-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FLOWDRILL B.V.PATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2217553

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69824285

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT