Global Patent Index - EP 0974033 A1

EP 0974033 A1 2000-01-26 - A DEVICE LEADING IN VENTILATION AIR

Title (en)

A DEVICE LEADING IN VENTILATION AIR

Title (de)

VENTILATIONSLUFTEINLASS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTREE D'AIR DE COMPENSATION DE VENTILATION

Publication

EP 0974033 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903048 A

Priority

  • FI 9800128 W
  • FI 970592 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836223A1] An intake of ventilation compensation air for use as an air distributor in the space formed between heating radiator (18) and outer wall (21), the device comprising a box (2), a connector part (1) fixed to the box for connection to air filter (3), a damper (7) and air flow ports (12, 13) for conveying compensation air into room air. The device has a first chamber as broad as the box (2), into which air comes from the outside, further a second chamber as broad as the box (2), out of which compensation air flows both from the chamber opposite side ports (12) to the side and the chamber lower edge port (13) upward parallel with radiator (18) surface, and a chambers-separating filter (3) between the chambers as broad as the box (2), inclined from its upper towards the radiator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/06; F24F 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/00 (2006.01); F24F 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0085 (2013.01); F24D 19/00 (2013.01); F24F 13/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9836223A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836223 A1 19980820; AT 232590 T 20030215; DE 69811354 D1 20030320; DE 69811354 T2 20031204; EP 0974033 A1 20000126; EP 0974033 B1 20030212; FI 970592 A0 19970212

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150213

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070212

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070212

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811354 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI GB SE

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI GB SE