Global patent index - EP 0974037 A1

EP 0974037 A1 2000-01-26 - INITIATOR WITH LOOSELY PACKED IGNITION CHARGE

Title (en)

INITIATOR WITH LOOSELY PACKED IGNITION CHARGE

Title (de)

ANZÜNDER MIT EINER LOSE AUFGEHÄUFTEN ZÜNDLADUNG

Title (fr)

INITIATEUR A CHARGE D'AMORCE FAIBLEMENT COMPACTE

Publication

EP 0974037 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920824 A

Priority

  • US 9806146 W
  • US 83166497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845663A1] An initiator (100) assembled from a housing (112), an output charge (144) and an initiation means (110, 120, 58, 54) includes a pulverulent ignition charge (46a) disposed in direct initiation relation to the initiation means, and an output charge (144) that may contain a pulverulent deflagration-to-detonation transition (DDT) charge (144a) and an explosive base charge (144b). The ignition charge (46a) has an average particle size of less than 10 microns, or even less than 5 microns, e.g., 1 to 2 microns. The initiation means may include a semiconductor bridge (18) and the ignition charge (46a) may be compacted with a force of less than about 5880 psi, e.g., with a force of 1000 psi. In another embodiment, an initiator (210) includes a low-energy electrical initiator (234), a loosely packed BNCP ignition charge (218) and a pyrotechnical output charge (214).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/10 (2006.01); C06C 7/00 (2006.01); F42B 3/12 (2006.01); F42B 3/13 (2006.01); F42B 3/195 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06C 7/00 (2013.01); F42B 3/121 (2013.01); F42B 3/13 (2013.01); F42B 3/195 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9845663A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845663 A1 19981015; AU 727918 B2 20010104; AU 7357398 A 19981030; BR 9808511 A 20010807; CA 2285568 A1 19981015; CA 2285568 C 20040817; CN 1264462 A 20000823; DE 69832372 D1 20051222; DE 69832372 T2 20060601; DK 0974037 T3 20060213; EP 0974037 A1 20000126; EP 0974037 A4 20021002; EP 0974037 B1 20051116; ES 2252835 T3 20060516; IN 190295 B 20030712; JP 2001523328 A 20011120; NO 317643 B1 20041129; NO 994945 A 19991209; NO 994945 D0 19991011; US 5889228 A 19990330; US 6408759 B1 20020625; ZA 9802987 B 19981026

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060401

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2252835

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-04-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-02-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-01-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69832372

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20051222

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB SE

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYNO NOBEL, INC.

2005-06-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: INITIATOR WITH LOOSELY PACKED IGNITION CHARGE

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB SE

2002-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 42B 3/10 A, 7F 42B 3/13 B, 7F 42B 3/195 B

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB SE