Global Patent Index - EP 0974102 A1

EP 0974102 A1 2000-01-26 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY FORMATTING A DOCUMENT ACCORDING TO DATA OBJECT TYPE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY FORMATTING A DOCUMENT ACCORDING TO DATA OBJECT TYPE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN FORMATIEREN EINES DOKUMENTS GEMÄSS DATENOBJEKTTYP

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE EN PAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN DOCUMENT EN FONCTION D'UN TYPE D'OBJET DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 0974102 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97914539 A

Priority

IL 9700122 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845788A1] A method for automatically formatting a complex document, which consists of text, graphics, or multimedia elements, displays the document on a computer screen. Input may be in the form of plain text with minimal instructions in conjunction with page structure definitions which describe the general "look and feel" of the desired. The actual content may be changed while maintaining the formatting structure without the necessity for reinputting the formatting instructions. Formatting is done within a page by page structure with the ability to display the beginning of multiple articles on a single page and continue them on subsequent pages. For example, the method could be used to automatically display a personalized electronic newspaper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/212 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845788 A1 19981015; AU 2176097 A 19981030; AU 749431 B2 20020627; CA 2286054 A1 19981015; EP 0974102 A1 20000126; EP 0974102 A4 20021023; JP 2001519061 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040909

2002-12-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 17/00 A, 7G 06F 17/21 B

2002-10-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXT INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXT INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY (ISRAEL) LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991021

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE