Global patent index - EP 0974153 A1

EP 0974153 A1 2000-01-26 - ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0974153 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925466 A

Priority

  • DE 19714611 A
  • DE 19727553 A
  • EP 9801981 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6399908B1] The invention relates to an electric switch (1) with a contact system (9) which consists of at least one fixed contact (10, 11) and of a movable contact tongue (12). A movable actuating member (5) is operatively connected to the contact tongue (12) for changing over the contact system (9). The contact tongue (12) is arranged on a bearing (18) designed in the manner of a knife-edge bearing. The switch point of the contact system (9) is adjustable by the shift of part of the contact system (9) in the direction of movement (20, 20') of the actuating member (5), in that the bearing (18) and/or the fixed contact (10, 11) and/or the contact tongue (12) is capable of being set in the direction of movement (20, 20') of the actuating member (5). In order to adjust the switch point of the contact system (9), part of the actuating member (5) may also be capable of being set in the direction of movement (20, 20') of said actuating member (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/00; H01H 1/34; H01H 5/18; H01H 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/28 (2006.01); H01H 1/34 (2006.01); H01H 5/18 (2006.01); H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/18 (2006.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/34 (2013.01); H01H 5/18 (2013.01); H01H 11/00 (2013.01); H01H 13/186 (2013.01); H01H 1/5805 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5888 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0075 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845865A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6399908 B1 20020604; AT 225983 T 20021015; EP 0974153 A1 20000126; EP 0974153 B1 20021009; JP 2002510423 A 20020402; WO 9845865 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-08-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021009

2003-04-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-01-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805899

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-14

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 225983

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020228

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991007

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT