Global patent index - EP 0974170 A1

EP 0974170 A1 2000-01-26 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTION STUD

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTION STUD

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDUNGSBOLZEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0974170 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914717 A

Priority

  • BE 9800052 W
  • GB 9707368 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847200A1] A terminal stud (1) to be applied to an electrically conductive material (14) on a glass surface (15) to form a strong unobtrusive connection for an electrical supply wire is provided by a stud comprising a hollowed base plate (7) to receive solder to secure the stud to the conductive material (14), the said base plate (7) having an outer periphery to contact the conductive material (14), the stud further comprising a rim (5, 6) extending from the said outer periphery in a direction externally to the said base plate (7) to provide an attachment for a connecting clip (2) of an electrical supply lead. The stud (1) is particularly concerned with the provision of electrical supply to a conductive material carried on the surface of a window such as a vehicle window.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/02; H05B 3/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H05B 3/84 (2006.01); H01R 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/84 (2013.01); H01R 4/028 (2013.01); H01R 11/22 (2013.01); H01R 12/57 (2013.01); H05B 2203/016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847200A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847200 A1 19981022; AU 6912498 A 19981111; BR 9810399 A 20000822; DE 69803050 D1 20020131; DE 69803050 T2 20020829; EP 0974170 A1 20000126; EP 0974170 B1 20011219; GB 9707368 D0 19970528; JP 2002505029 A 20020212; KR 20000076159 A 20001226; PL 336099 A1 20000605; RU 99123843 A 20011027

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090410

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090410

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090410

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090402

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SPLIFAR

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SPLIFAR

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2004-06-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69803050

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020131

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19991111

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19991111