Global Patent Index - EP 0974279 A2

EP 0974279 A2 2000-01-26 - Protecting boot or shoe for working with high pressure water spray cleaning machines until about 3500 Bar

Title (en)

Protecting boot or shoe for working with high pressure water spray cleaning machines until about 3500 Bar

Title (de)

Schutzstiefel oder -schuhe für Arbeiten mit Flüssigkeitsstrahlern und -werkzeugen bis ca. 3500 Bar

Title (fr)

Chaussure ou botte de protection pour le travail avec une machine de nettoyage à l'eau sous haute pression jusqu'à environ 3500 Bar

Publication

EP 0974279 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250144 A

Priority

DE 29807824 U

Abstract (en)

The boot or shoe is made of one or more layers of flexible fabric or sheeting made of resistant, non-tear plastic material or of knitted or woven metal filaments or a combination of these materials. The layers are incorporated in one or more parts of the boot or shoe and are not rigidly attached at all points to the surrounding layers. There are no outer straps and clasps.

Abstract (de)

Der Schutzstiefel oder Schutzschuh für Hochdruckarbeiten mit Flüssigkeitsstrahlern bis ca. 3500 Bar erhält speziell eingebaute, meist mehrlagige flexible und leichte Hochdruckschutzeinlagen welche, je nach Druck- und Anwendungsbereich, aus unterschiedlichen geeigneten Materialien, Materialformen und -größen bestehen. Die Hochdruckschutzeinlagen können ein- oder mehrlagig in verschiedenen Kombinationen und Stiefelbereichen eingebaut sein (1,2). Die äußere Lage der Hochdruckschutzbereiche des Stiefels oder der Schuhe (1,2,4) ist farblich anders als die Restbereiche (3,5) des Stiefels ausgeführt. Die eingebauten Schutzschichten tragen kaum auf und erlauben einen guten Tragekomfort der Hochdruckschutzstiefel und -schuhe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/32; A43B 1/00; A43B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 1/00 (2006.01); A43B 7/32 (2006.01); A43B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 1/04 (2013.01); A43B 1/00 (2013.01); A43B 3/02 (2013.01); A43B 7/32 (2013.01); A43B 23/0225 (2013.01); A43B 23/023 (2013.01); A43B 23/024 (2013.01); A43B 23/026 (2013.01); A43B 23/0295 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807824 U1 19980903; EP 0974279 A2 20000126; EP 0974279 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040503

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020110

2000-11-15 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000811;LT PAYMENT 20000811;LV PAYMENT 20000811;MK PAYMENT 20000811;RO PAYMENT 20000811;SI PAYMENT 20000811

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000811;LT PAYMENT 20000811;LV PAYMENT 20000811;RO PAYMENT 20000811;SI PAYMENT 20000811

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI