Global patent index - EP 0974280 A1

EP 0974280 A1 2000-01-26 - Shoe with hull-shaped sole stitched to the upper

Title (en)

Shoe with hull-shaped sole stitched to the upper

Title (de)

Schuh mit rumpfförmige Sohle an den Schaft genäht

Title (fr)

Chaussure avec semelle en forme de coque cousue à la tige

Publication

EP 0974280 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114161 A

Priority

IT VR980042 U

Abstract (en)

A shoe with a hull-shaped sole and a seam (38) between the sole (2) and the upper (4), comprising a sole (2) which has a peripheral rim (3) to which the edge of the upper (4) is sewn; the edge of the upper (4) is folded over toward the inside of the sole (2) at the peripheral rim (3) and is fixed thereto by sewing from the inside of the upper (4) toward the outside of the sole (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT 98000042 U

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974280 A1 20000126; IT 245376 Y1 20020320; IT VR980042 U1 20000121

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARRADORI, FIORENZO

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CARRADORI, FIORENZO

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000629

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI