Global Patent Index - EP 0974286 A1

EP 0974286 A1 2000-01-26 - Disposable make-up applicator

Title (en)

Disposable make-up applicator

Title (de)

Wegwerfauftragselement for Schminkprodukte

Title (fr)

Applicateur de maquillage jetable

Publication

EP 0974286 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401685 A

Priority

FR 9809225 A

Abstract (en)

The applicator consists of a layer of a supple porous material having at least one portion of one face impregnated with a cosmetic product, and the opposite face covered by an impermeable film. The applicator consists of a layer (1) of a supple porous material having at least one portion (2) of one face (1a) impregnated with a cosmetic product, and the opposite face covered by an impermeable film (3). The first face has at least one zone (4) of its peripheral area which is not impregnated with the product, the zone being designed for gripping the applicator and/or spreading the applied product. The cosmetic product can be applied by serigraphy or molding on the porous layer, which can be a woven or non-woven fabric or an open-pore cellular material.

Abstract (fr)

Applicateur (A) de maquillage jetable, comportant au moins une couche (1) d'un matériau poreux, souple dont au moins une partie (2) d'une première face (1a) est imprégnée d'au moins un produit de maquillage délitable, une seconde face (1b), opposée à la première, étant couverte d'un film imperméable (3). La première face (1a) présente au moins une zone de portion périphérique (4), non imprégnée par ledit produit de maquillage, servant de zone de préhension de l'applicateur et/ou de zone d'estompage du produit appliqué par l'utilisateur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 33/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 33/38 (2006.01); A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/28 (2013.01); A45D 33/38 (2013.01); A45D 40/0087 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1036 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 1836833 A 19311215 - BUTLER AMES

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974286 A1 20000126; EP 0974286 B1 20031008; DE 69911863 D1 20031113; DE 69911863 T2 20040805; ES 2209356 T3 20040616; FR 2781132 A1 20000121; FR 2781132 B1 20000825; JP 2000041731 A 20000215; JP 3283489 B2 20020520; US 6312181 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090706

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090707

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090706

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090706

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209356 T3

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911863 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISPOSABLE MAKE-UP APPLICATOR

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020819

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI