Global patent index - EP 0974295 A2

EP 0974295 A2 2000-01-26 - Clothing hanger

Title (en)

Clothing hanger

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre pour vêtements

Publication

EP 0974295 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113913 A

Priority

DE 29812823 U

Abstract (en)

The main body (4) of the hanger has two arms (2,3) and a hook (6) possessing a shaft (10) and a curved part (60). The shaft part defining a suspension axis (5) is joined to the center of the main body. The hook carries data on the type of clothing. A support frame (7) on the hook forms an enclosed container space (8). The support frame is positioned in the transition between the shaft and curved part, and is placed on the side of the suspension axis facing away from the hook's opening (61). The support frame ends underneath a little apart (1) above the main body.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kleiderbügel besteht in zweiteiliger Ausführung aus einem zwei Bügelarme (2, 3) aufweisenden Bügelkörper (4) und einem einen Schaftteil (10) sowie einen Bogenteil (60) aufweisenden Bügelhaken (6; 6'). Der mit eine Hängeachse (5) definierende Schaftteil (10) ist mittig mit dem Bügelkörper (4) verbunden. An dem Bügelhaken (6; 6') ist ein mit kleiderspezifischen Daten versehener Informationsträger (A) über eine Halterung festlegbar. Als Halterung ist ein dem Bügelhaken (6; 6') zugeordneter Tragrahmen (7; 7'; 7'') vorgesehen, der einen im wesentlichen geschlossenen Aufnahmeraum (8; 8'; 8'') bildet. Der erfindungsgemäße Tragrahmen (7; 7';7'') ist am Bügelhaken (6) im Bereich des Überganges des Schaftteiles (10) zum Bogenteil (60) angeordnet und dabei auf der der Hakenöffnung (61) abgewandten Seite der Hängeachse (5) gelegen, wobei der Tragrahmen (7; 7'; 7'') unterseitig im Abstand (T) oberhalb des Bügelkörpers (4) endet und zumindest mit seinem Hauptteil innerhalb eines Bereiches vorgesehen ist, der von der Hängeachse (5) und von einer zu dieser parallelen Projektionslinie (P) des Bogenteils (60) auf den Bügelkörper (4) seitlich begrenzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/14; A47G 25/32; E05B 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/24 (2006.01); A47G 25/14 (2006.01); A47G 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/32 (2013.01); A47F 7/24 (2013.01); A47G 25/1428 (2013.01); A47G 25/145 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 1710296 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812823 U1 19991202; EP 0974295 A2 20000126; EP 0974295 A3 20050119

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 25/14 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 25/32 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 69/00 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI