Global Patent Index - EP 0974405 A2

EP 0974405 A2 2000-01-26 - Plant for separating a material mixture

Title (en)

Plant for separating a material mixture

Title (de)

Anlage zum Trennen einer Gut-Mischung

Title (fr)

Installation pour séparer un mélange de matériaux

Publication

EP 0974405 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98115381 A

Priority

  • DE 19832872 A
  • DE 19835447 A

Abstract (en)

The separator (10) has an individual article separator (14) with a roller (18) for supporting the translation movement of the individual articles (28,30). The roller has a downwardly curved auger (20) with an inlet adjacent to the roller and a discharge end (60) for the round articles.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Anlage (10) zum Trennen runder Gut-Körper (28) von gebrochenen bzw. unregelmäßigen Gut-Körpern (30) beschrieben, die eine Größe von mindestens 10 mm und die ein einheitliches spezifisches Gewicht besitzen. Die Anlage (10) weist eine Vereinzelungs-Einrichtung (14), eine der Vereinzelungseinrichtung (14) nachgeordnete Walze (18) zur Überlagerung der Translationsbewegung der vereinzelten Gut-Körper (28, 30) mit einem Drehimpuls, und eine der Walze (18) nachgeordnete, nach unten geneigte bogenförmige Wendelbahn-Einrichtung (20) auf, die einen zur Walze benachbarten Separier-Endabschnitt (58) und davon entfernt einen Ausgabe-Endabschnitt (60) aufweist. Am Separier-Endabschnitt (58) werden die gebrochenen Gut-Körper (30) und am Ausgabe-Endabschnitt (60) werden die runden Gut-Körper (28) ausgegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/00; B07B 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/00 (2006.01); B07B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/16 (2013.01); B07B 13/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK ES FR GB PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974405 A2 20000126; EP 0974405 A3 20010124; EP 0974405 B1 20020605; DK 0974405 T3 20020701; ES 2180102 T3 20030201

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040818

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-08-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030821

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-04-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ZIEGLER & CO. GMBH

2003-04-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KIRCHNER, ERNST L.

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180102 T3

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-09-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK ES FR GB PT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK ES FR GB PT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001230

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 07B 13/00 A, 7B 07B 13/16 B, 7B 07B 13/11 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK ES FR GB PT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI