Global patent index - EP 0974410 A2

EP 0974410 A2 2000-01-26 - Machine with hydraulically controlled counterpressure holding element

Title (en)

Machine with hydraulically controlled counterpressure holding element

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit druckmittelbetätigten Gegendrückhaltungselement

Title (fr)

Dispositif à contrôle hydraulique pour élément de tenue à contrepression

Publication

EP 0974410 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99850120 A

Priority

SE 9802566 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a machine with a hydraulically controlled counterpressure element. The machine comprises a frame and top and lower machine parts (1, 2) in a conventional way for performing the embossing. According to the invention the counterpressure element (6, 11) is connected to a hydraulic cylinder (4, 12), said counterpressure element engaging the plate (3). The hydraulic cylinder (4, 12) is connected to a hydraulic circuit having a controllable hydraulic pressure, so that the counterpressure element is pressed back at the controlled pressure during an embossing operation. The counterpressure element may be included in a holding means to hold the plate securely during the embossing. According to the invention a machine part (1) is then connected to a positive counterpressure element (10) and another machine part (2) is connected to a hydraulic cylinder (4), said hydraulic cylinder (4) having a plunger and a stem (5) connected to a gripping means (6) holding the plate (3) together with the positive counterpressure element (10), such that the plunger during an embossing operation is pressed back at a controlled pressure. The holding means provides a secure holding through the whole press operation. The counterpressure element may also be included in an embossing counterpressure element, in which the counterpressure may be set in order to achieve a pre-embossing or a pressure controlled embossing. The invention may be applied to all types of machines in which counterpressure elements are required. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 24/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/02 (2006.01); B21D 24/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/02 (2013.01); B21D 24/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974410 A2 20000126; EP 0974410 A3 20030423; SE 518856 C2 20021126; SE 9802566 D0 19980717; SE 9802566 L 20000118

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031024

2004-02-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EP TECHNOLOGY AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EP TECHNOLOGY AB

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PERSSON, LARS

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI