Global Patent Index - EP 0974412 A3

EP 0974412 A3 2001-05-16 - Pivotable feeder for pivoting elongated workpieces transversally, in particular wire pieces

Title (en)

Pivotable feeder for pivoting elongated workpieces transversally, in particular wire pieces

Title (de)

Schwenkförderer zum Querverschwenken länglicher Werkstücke, insbesondere Drahtstücke

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation pivotable pour le pivotement transversal de pièces allongées, en particulier piéces en fil métalliques

Publication

EP 0974412 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890238 A

Priority

AT 159598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974412A2] <NOV>Conveyor has sector shaped conveyor cradle (2) with curved support strips (3) and conveyor frame (4) supported on cross link (14). Forwarding strips (5) protrude between the support strips (3) and are attached to trunnions (7) on the conveyor frame (4) and the support strips (3) are attached to trunnions (6). <DDSC>The conveyor (1) has a sector shaped, conveyor cradle (2) with coaxial curved support strips (3) in the vertical axis. A conveyor frame (4) is located under the support strips, and supported in swivel-adjustable position with regards to the conveyor cradle. The frame has protruding forwarding strips (5) between the support strips (3). The support strips and the forwarding strips (5) form notch-like workpiece slots which are arranged on radials to the vertical axis, at the same angle but offset to each other. Hence the workpieces (D) lies radial to the vertical axis (H) in the slots. The conveyor frame (4) is driven (10) in an alternating convey and return path. The drive (10) is a crank drive (11) with axle normal to the vertical axis. The conveyor frame is supported on a cross link (14)with axle (I) coaxial to the vertical axis (H) and another axis (II) normal to the vertical axis and crank axle. A workpiece laid in a first work piece slot of the support strip (3) is step-wise moved to the next slot, so one workpiece after the other is conveyed to fill the swivel conveyor (1). <

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 23/00; B65G 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 23/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974412 A2 20000126; EP 0974412 A3 20010516; AT 406147 B 20000225; AT A159598 A 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21F 23/00 A, 7B 65G 25/02 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI