Global patent index - EP 0974428 A2

EP 0974428 A2 2000-01-26 - Handheld drilling machine with compressed-air-operated percussion mechanism

Title (en)

Handheld drilling machine with compressed-air-operated percussion mechanism

Title (de)

Handbohrgerät mit drucklufterregtem Schlagwerk

Title (fr)

Machine à forer portable avec mécanisme à percussion mû à l' air comprimé

Publication

EP 0974428 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810527 A

Priority

DE 19832946 A

Abstract (en)

The output shaft (15) carries a chuck and is axially moveable when impacted by the piston (30) which slides back and forth in the cylinder housing (22) according to the position of a shuttle (41), and bores (46-52) with pressure applied to an opening (24). Air is released through an opening (23). As the piston contacts the output shaft the shuttle is pushed back to reverse the air flow until the piston contacts a rear face (26), after which it again reverses the air flow.

Abstract (de)

Ein Handbohrgerät weist ein drucklufterregtes Schlagwerk zur Erzeugung von axialen Schlägen auf, das über ein Schaltventil mit einer Druckluftquelle verbunden ist. Das Schlagwerk (21) umfasst einen Pneumatikzylinder (22), der wenigstens eine Belüftungs-und wenigstens eine Entlüftungsbohrung (23, 24) aufweist. Innerhalb des Pneumatikzylinders (22) ist ein Schlagkolben (30) geführt, der mit Druckluft beaufschlagbar und periodisch gegen ein Döpperelement (15) beschleunigbar ist. Das Döpperelement (15) durchsetzt eine vordere Begrenzungswand (25) des Pneumatikzylinders (22) axial und dient der Übertragung von axialen Schlägen an ein in eine Werkzeugaufnahme eingespanntes Bohr- oder Meisselwerkzeug. Ein im Gehäuse angeordneter Drehantrieb erlaubt eine Rotation des in die Werkzeugaufnahme eingespannten Bohr- oder Meisselwerkzeugs um seine Achse. Das Schaltventil ist im Schlagkolben integriert und weist Aussparungen und Bohrungen (46 - 52) auf, die abwechselnd mit der Be- bzw. der Entlüftungsbohrung (23, 24) im Pneumatikzylinder (22) in Wirkverbindung bringbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/08; B25D 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 9/04 (2006.01); B25D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/00 (2013.01); B25D 9/04 (2013.01); B25D 17/06 (2013.01); B25D 2211/003 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0023 (2013.01); B25D 2250/341 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974428 A2 20000126; EP 0974428 A3 20030212; CN 1251794 A 20000503; DE 19832946 A1 20000127; JP 2000071117 A 20000307; US 6209659 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060807

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 25D 16/00 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 25D 9/20 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI