Global patent index - EP 0974429 A2

EP 0974429 A2 2000-01-26 - Toolholder and tool for use theirin

Title (en)

Toolholder and tool for use theirin

Title (de)

Werkzeughalter und darin einsetzbares Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Porte-outil et outil à utiliser avec celui-ci

Publication

EP 0974429 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114144 A

Priority

DE 29813159 U

Abstract (en)

The holder has a mounting (12) for a shaft of the tool (14) with at least one locking part (22,24) projecting into the mounting for locking the tool shaft. Two opposing capturing sections (18,20) have symmetrical and radially running flanks (30,32). The capturing sections extend over different angular regions from one another, so that the flanks lie at different diameters. One of the capturing sections extends over 30 degrees and the other extends over 48 degrees. The capturing sections project inwards to the same radial depth. The shaft of the tool has at least one lock groove (26,28) and two capturing grooves (34,36).

Abstract (de)

Ein Werkzeughalter, insbesondere für ein Bohr- oder Meißelwerkzeug, mit einer Aufnahme (12) für einen Schaft (14) des Werkzeugs, mindestens einem in die Aufnahme (12) hineinragenden Verriegelungsteil (22, 24) zum Verriegeln des Werkzeugschafts (14) in der Aufnahme (12) und mit zwei einander diametral gegenüberliegenden Mitnahmeteilen (18, 20), die zu dem Durchmesser (D), auf dem sie angeordnet sind, symmetrisch sind und jeweils eine radial verlaufende Mitnahmeflanke (30, 32) aufweisen, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Mitnahmeteile (18, 20) sich jeweils über einen voneinander unterscheidenden Winkelbereich erstrecken, so daß die beiden Mitnahmeflanken (30, 32) auf unterschiedlichen Durchmessern liegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/088 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813159 U1 19981203; EP 0974429 A2 20000126; EP 0974429 A3 20030129; ES 2144388 T1 20000616

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-11-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144388

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-05-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-04-07 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI