Global patent index - EP 0974432 A1

EP 0974432 A1 2000-01-26 - Knife assembly

Title (en)

Knife assembly

Title (de)

Schneidemesseranordung

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour couteau de coupe

Publication

EP 0974432 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305446 A

Priority

GB 9815206 A

Abstract (en)

In a food product slicing machine of the type having a rotating circular knife blade, the knife blade having a substantially flat obverse face and reverse face, the edge of the blade on the reverse face being ground at an angle to produce a cutting edge. The knife blade has a circular recess formed in the reverse face concentric with the knife blade and a deflector mounted within the recess, the outer surface of the deflector being arranged to be aligned with the reverse face or slightly below the reverse face at the circumference of the recess. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/0006 (2013.01); B26D 7/32 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0046 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974432 A1 20000126; GB 2339526 A 20000202; GB 9815206 D0 19980909; GB 9916005 D0 19990908

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011110

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVERY BERKEL LIMITED

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE IT NL

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI