Global Patent Index - EP 0974436 A1

EP 0974436 A1 2000-01-26 - Facade, method for manufacturing a facade, table for use in the method and assembly of section elements for use in the method

Title (en)

Facade, method for manufacturing a facade, table for use in the method and assembly of section elements for use in the method

Title (de)

Fassadenplatte , Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Fassadenplatte , Schaltisch und Anordnung von Verbindungsabschnitten für dieses Verfahren

Title (fr)

Elément de façade , méthode pour sa fabrication , table de moulage et groupe d'éléments d'assemblage utilisés dans la méthode

Publication

EP 0974436 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202434 A

Priority

NL 1009709 A

Abstract (en)

Method for prefabricating a facade (G), wherein, utilizing a table (T) provided with a profile surface (2), outer facade elements (5) are placed on the table (T) and interconnected by mortar or concrete mortar (11) to form an outer wall. Next, an inner wall (4) element is placed. The outer wall (5) and the inner wall element (4) are interconnected by an assembly of sections. The assembly, also forming part of the invention, comprises first (8) and second sections (12) and at least one connecting section (13,13'), capable of interconnecting a first section (8) and a second section (12). The invention also relates to a table (T) used for carrying out the method, which table is provided with a table top (1) which is swivellable about a horizontal axis (22) and which is provided with a profile surface (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/00; E04C 2/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974436 A1 20000126; EP 0974436 B1 20040421; DE 69916539 D1 20040527; DE 69916539 T2 20050512; NL 1009709 C2 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080722

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080722

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ANTONIUS ADRIANUS HENDRIKA GERRITS

- Effective date: 20070628

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916539 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2003-03-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A FACADE AND ASSEMBLY OF SECTION ELEMENTS FOR USE IN THE METHOD

2002-12-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020930

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE GB NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE GB NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI