Global Patent Index - EP 0974450 A3

EP 0974450 A3 2000-04-26 - Window bags and a method of manufacture thereof

Title (en)

Window bags and a method of manufacture thereof

Title (de)

Fenstersack und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Sac à fenêtre et son procédé de production

Publication

EP 0974450 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305853 A

Priority

GB 9815991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974450A2] A method of manufacturing a bag (1) with at least one window is provided. The method comprises the steps of firstly providing at least one window (8) in a sheet (2) of a first material. Secondly a second material is laminated to at least one surface of the sheet (2) of the first material such that the second material seals around the edges of the or each window (8). Lastly a bag (1) is formed from the laminated, windowed sheet of material such that one or more of the inner and/or outer surfaces of the bag (1) has the second material laminated thereto. The first material preferably comprises paper while the second material preferably comprises a plastics material. The lamination may be achieved by means of an adhesive or by heat-welding. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/82; B31B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/82 (2006.01); B31B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 70/81 (2017.08); B31B 70/82 (2017.08); B31B 2155/00 (2017.08); B31B 2170/20 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974450 A2 20000126; EP 0974450 A3 20000426; GB 2339718 A 20000209; GB 9815991 D0 19980923; GB 9917243 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 19/82 A, 7B 31B 39/00 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI