Global Patent Index - EP 0974457 A3

EP 0974457 A3 2000-05-17 - Device and method for adjusting an inclination in a damping unit of a rotary offset printing press

Title (en)

Device and method for adjusting an inclination in a damping unit of a rotary offset printing press

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Einstellung einer Schrägposition in dem Feuchtwerk einer Rollenrotations-Offsetdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour ajuster l'inclinaison dans un dispositif de mouillage d'une machine à imprimer rotative offset à bobines

Publication

EP 0974457 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111955 A

Priority

US 12142898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974457A2] The two rollers (PN) are movably mounted in the printer (P). At least one link (7,8) which consist of a top (7) and bottom (8) tilting positioned piece is connected to the first and second roller and moves both rollers simultaneously by its movement. An adjusting element (10) is connected to the at least one link, and consists of a rotarily mounted arm on which is a spring piston (13,15).fitting into one of the holes (14) . A first and second tilting positioned rod (4) is joined to a link and roller each, and has a fine-adjustment screw head (20)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/40; B41F 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/24 (2006.01); B41F 7/40 (2006.01); B41F 33/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974457 A2 20000126; EP 0974457 A3 20000517; EP 0974457 B1 20030402; DE 19928879 A1 20000127; DE 59904811 D1 20030508; JP 2000043232 A 20000215; US 6302019 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-02-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-10-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904811 P 20030508

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-10-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINT UNIT IN A ROTARY OFFSET PRINTING PRESS

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI