Global patent index - EP 0974479 A2

EP 0974479 A2 2000-01-26 - Method for the regulation of motor driven adjusting device in motor vehicle

Title (en)

Method for the regulation of motor driven adjusting device in motor vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung motorisch angetriebener Verstelleinrichtungen in Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Procedé pour la régulation motorisée d'un dispositif de réglage pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0974479 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250245 A

Priority

  • DE 19835091 A
  • DE 19916400 A

Abstract (en)

The adjusting arrangement control involves a partitioned transducer (1) of e.g. electromagnetic type coupled to a drive motor whose rotation rate signal is received by a detector (2) of e.g. Hall-sensor type, whose output (U1) is in turn evaluated by a control unit which accordingly sets the revolution rate of the motor. The tolerance-dependent properties of the transducer partitions (11-16) and e.g. detector threshold hystereses are accounted for during the detector output signal evaluation, by applying a test transducer movement of e.g. constant speed or acceleration.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Regelung motorisch angetriebener Verstelleinrichtungen in Kraftfahrzeugen mit einem partitionierten, mit der Motorwelle (10) verbundenen Signalgeber (1), insbesondere einem Multipolmagneten, mit mindestens einem dem Signalgeber (1) zugeordneten Sensor (2), insbesondere einem magnetosensitiven Element, und mit einer Elektronikeinheit zur Auswertung der Sensorsignale (U1), werden die toleranzbedingten charakteristischen Eigenschaften der Signalgeberpartitionen bei der Auswertung der Sensorsignale berücksichtigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 7/057; G01P 3/487; G01P 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E05F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05F 15/695 (2013.01); E05F 15/697 (2013.01); E05F 15/40 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/336 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/342 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/502 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01); Y10S 388/902 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5404673 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974479 A2 20000126; EP 0974479 A3 20000209; EP 0974479 B1 20030813; DE 19916400 C1 20000525; ES 2205707 T3 20040501; US 6225770 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120722

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120722

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120722

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205707

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59906568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030918

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000307

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI