Global patent index - EP 0974485 A2

EP 0974485 A2 2000-01-26 - Signal lamp for vehicle

Title (en)

Signal lamp for vehicle

Title (de)

Signalleuchte für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0974485 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113964 A

Priority

JP 20946098 A

Abstract (en)

A signal lamp (1) for a vehicle is composed of a plurality of LED lamps (2) as a light source, a reflecting surface (3) corresponding to the light-emitting surface of the signal lamp, a housing for accommodating the LED lamps (2) and the reflecting surface (3), and an outer lens (5) disposed in opposing relation to the reflecting surface. The LED lamps (2) are arranged along the periphery of the light-emitting surface such that the illuminating direction thereof is toward the center of the reflecting surface (3). The reflecting surface (3) is partitioned into segments corresponding in number to the LED lamps (2). Preferably, the reflecting surface has a circular configuration. The segments into which the reflecting surface is partitioned are arranged radially around the center of the reflecting surface. In this case, the LED lamps are arranged in an annular configuration along the periphery of the reflecting surface (3). A shade (5) for blocking direct light beams from the LED lamps (2) is provided adjacent the LED lamps (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60Q 1/26; F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/26 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21S 13/00 (2006.01); F21S 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/00 (2006.01); H01L 33/60 (2010.01); F21W 111/00 (2006.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/23 (2013.01); B60Q 1/2696 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01); F21V 7/0008 (2013.01); F21Y 2101/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974485 A2 20000126; EP 0974485 A3 20010425; EP 0974485 B1 20060405; DE 69930693 D1 20060518; DE 69930693 T2 20070111; JP 2000040410 A 20000208; JP 2960928 B1 19991012; US 6234646 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69930693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20060518

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-04-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60Q 1/26 20060101AFI20060210BHEP

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101ALI20060210BHEP

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 13/00 20060101ALI20060210BHEP

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 19/00 20060101ALI20060210BHEP

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21W 111/00 20060101ALI20060210BHEP

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 60Q 1/26 A, 7F 21Q 1/00 B, 7F 21W 111:00 Z

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI