Global patent index - EP 0974521 A1

EP 0974521 A1 2000-01-26 - Device for gathering and bundling paper products

Title (en)

Device for gathering and bundling paper products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sammeln und Bündeln von Papierprodukten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rassembler et lier des produits en papier

Publication

EP 0974521 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810595 A

Priority

CH 151098 A

Abstract (en)

A container (1), open at the top, has a lengthwise and transverse direction and has sides (6,7) and a base (5) on which the paper products are superimposed. The container has a top-opening passage (4) for pulling through a cord or strip. The passage runs diagonally to the alignment of the paper products. The sides extend horizontally over part of the sides so that the container is open sideways at both ends of the horizontal passage. The container and its feet (2) are made of a continuous bar or tubing.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung dient zum Sammeln und Bündeln von flachen und im wesentlichen rechteckigen Papierprodukten (9a) unter Verwendung einer Schnur oder eines schmalen Bandes (14). Ein oben offener Behälter (1) weist einen Boden (5) auf, auf dem die Papierprodukte (9a) übereinander abzulegen sind. Zum Durchziehen einer Schnur oder eines Bandes (14) verläuft ein horizontaler Durchgang (4) im Boden (5) im wesentlichen diagonal zur vorgesehenen Ausrichtung der Papierprodukte (9a). Beispielsweise ein Zeitungsbündel kann mit einer offenen oder geschlossenen Schlaufe sehr einfach und ohne Anheben des Bündels geschnürt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/083 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

[X] US 4603542 A

Citation (examination)

US 3952876 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974521 A1 20000126; CH 692736 A5 20021015

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020130

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FI LI SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI LI SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI