Global Patent Index - EP 0974525 A1

EP 0974525 A1 2000-01-26 - Container with retractable pouring spout

Title (en)

Container with retractable pouring spout

Title (de)

Behälter mit einziehbarer Ausgiesstülle

Title (fr)

Récipient à bec verseur rétractable

Publication

EP 0974525 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305914 A

Priority

GB 9816056 A

Abstract (en)

A container for petrol etc. has a pouring spout (30) normally stored within the container (position A) but arranged to the withdrawn lengthwise through the container outlet, the inner end (32) of the spout and the outlet (20) having complementary screw-threads arranged for the spout (30) to be retained in its withdrawn position (B). A closure cap (40) is screw-threaded to the outer end of the spout and to the container outlet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974525 A1 20000126; EP 0974525 B1 20040317; DE 69915549 D1 20040422; DE 69915549 T2 20050324; DK 0974525 T3 20040719; GB 2339759 A 20000209; GB 2339759 B 20020807; GB 9816056 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111125

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-04-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-08-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915549 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR NL SE

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010809

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR NL SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR NL SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI