Global patent index - EP 0974528 A1

EP 0974528 A1 2000-01-26 - Closure element of natural cork

Title (en)

Closure element of natural cork

Title (de)

Verschlusselement aus Kork

Title (fr)

Elément de fermeture en liège

Publication

EP 0974528 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830453 A

Priority

IT BO980460 A

Abstract (en)

A closure element (1; 9; 15) of natural cork for bottles containing drinkable liquids, is adapted to be inserted with interference into the neck (21) of a bottle (20), the neck (21) having a determined first axis (22), the closure element (1; 9; 15) having the shape of a geometric solid with a constant cross-section along a second axis (2; 10; 16) coincident with the first axis (22) when the stopper (1; 9; 15) is inserted into the neck (21) and a plurality of lenticels (6) characteristic of the natural cork, which are distributed into the closure element (1; 9; 15), the lenticels being substantially parallel to each other and extending in a determined direction (R); the closure element (1; 9; 15) being oriented with respect to the lenticels (6) so that the second axis (2; 10; 16) is substantially parallel to said lenticels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/0011 (2013.01); B65D 39/00 (2013.01); B65D 39/0058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974528 A1 20000126; IT 1304459 B1 20010319; IT BO980460 A1 20000124

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR PT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR PT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI